Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julien-Louis-Edouard-Marie Gorju, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Urundi

Titular Bishop of Musti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1868BornSaint-Servan, France
22 Sep 189223.7Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
26 Apr 192253.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Urundi, Burundi
26 Apr 192253.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Musti
15 Aug 192253.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Musti
29 May 193667.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Urundi, Burundi
14 Jan 194273.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Urundi, Burundi

MicroData Summary for Julien-Louis-Edouard-Marie Gorju:
Bishop Julien-Louis-Edouard-Marie Gorju M. Afr. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Urundi

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015