Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salutaris Melchior Libena

Bishop of Ifakara, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1963 Born
29 Jun 199127.5Ordained PriestPriest of Mahenge, Tanzania
28 Jan 201046.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dar-es-Salaam, Tanzania
28 Jan 201046.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sutunurca
19 Mar 201046.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sutunurca
14 Jan 201248.1AppointedBishop of Ifakara, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Salutaris Melchior Libena
Bishop Salutaris Melchior Libena (born ) Bishop of Ifakara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceItete

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ifakara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Jan 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,591

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018