Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephano Lameck Musomba, O.S.A.

Auxiliary Bishop of Dar-es-Salaam, Tanzania

Titular Bishop of Perdices


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1969 Born
25 Sep 200233.0Solemn VowsPriest of Order of St. Augustine
24 Jul 200333.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
7 Jul 202151.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dar-es-Salaam, Tanzania
7 Jul 202151.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Perdices
21 Sep 202151.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Perdices

MicroData Summary for Stephano Lameck Musomba
Bishop Stephano Lameck Musomba O.S.A. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Dar-es-Salaam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMalonji, Diocese of Mbeya
Ordained BishopGrounds of, Msimbazi Center, Dar-es-Salaam, Archdiocese of Dar-es-Salaam

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Dar-es-Salaam.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Jul 2021
  • mn: CB, 7 Jul 2021
  • ob/c2: CB, 16 Sep 2021
  • c34: CB, 21 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 21 Sep 2021

Quantcast