Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustine Ndeliakyama Shao, C.S.Sp.

Bishop of Zanzibar, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1951 Born
4 Jun 198331.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
30 Nov 199645.1AppointedBishop of Zanzibar, Tanzania
27 Apr 199745.5Ordained BishopBishop of Zanzibar, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Augustine Ndeliakyama Shao
Bishop Augustine Ndeliakyama Shao C.S.Sp. (born ) Bishop of Zanzibar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMengwe

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Zanzibar.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 12,996

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018