Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardin Francis Mfumbusa

Bishop of Kondoa, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1962 Born
14 Jun 199230.2Ordained PriestPriest of Dodoma, Tanzania
12 Mar 201148.9AppointedBishop of Kondoa, Tanzania
15 May 201149.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kondoa, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Bernardin Francis Mfumbusa
Bishop Bernardin Francis Mfumbusa (born ) Bishop of Kondoa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArusha

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kondoa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 31 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,057

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018