Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Pascal Kikoti

Deceased

Bishop of Mpanda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1957BornIhumbo
29 Jun 198831.3Ordained PriestPriest
23 Oct 200043.6AppointedBishop of Mpanda, Tanzania
14 Jan 200143.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mpanda, Tanzania
28 Aug 201255.5DiedBishop of Mpanda, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for William Pascal Kikoti:
Bishop William Pascal Kikoti (born , died ) Bishop of Mpanda

  • a priest for 24.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,884
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013