Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Josaphat Louis Lebulu

Archbishop Emeritus of Arusha, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1942 Born
11 Dec 196826.4Ordained PriestPriest of Same, Tanzania
12 Feb 197936.6AppointedBishop of Same, Tanzania
24 May 197936.9Ordained BishopBishop of Same, Tanzania
28 Nov 199856.4AppointedBishop of Arusha, Tanzania
16 Mar 199956.7AppointedArchbishop of Arusha, Tanzania
27 Dec 201775.5RetiredArchbishop of Arusha, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Josaphat Louis Lebulu
Archbishop Josaphat Louis Lebulu (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Arusha

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKisangara

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Arusha.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 21 Jun 2018

Quantcast