Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacob Venance Koda

Bishop Emeritus of Same


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1957 BornKilomeni
25 Jun 198729.5Ordained PriestPriest of Same, Tanzania
16 Mar 199941.3AppointedBishop of Same, Tanzania
30 May 199941.5Ordained BishopBishop of Same, Tanzania
15 Apr 201052.3ResignedBishop of Same, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Jacob Venance Koda:
Bishop Jacob Venance Koda (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Same

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Same.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Apr 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,566

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013