Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Musoma

Dioecesis Musomensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 5 July 1957
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Mwanza
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Tanzania, United Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 25,150 (9,714 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 93, Musoma, Tanzania
  • Telephone: (028)2622.017; 2622.417
  • Fax: 2622.721

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Musoma-Maswa
11 April 1946ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Mwanza Vicariate Apostolic of Musoma-Maswa (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Musoma
24 June 1950SplitVicariate Apostolic of Musoma-Maswa Prefecture Apostolic of Musoma
Vicariate Apostolic of Maswa
Diocese of Musoma
5 July 1957ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Musoma Diocese of Musoma
27 November 2010Territory LostDiocese of Musoma
Archdiocese of Mwanza
Diocese of Bunda (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Musoma
195010,448254,4164.1%141474651ap1951
Diocese of Musoma
197098,949535,00018.5%538432,301415318ap1971
1980104,400745,00014.0%1021313,367245519ap1981
1990168,271917,00018.4%1522374,547299723ap1991
1999200,1901,165,00017.2%3521563,5742814225ap2000
2000204,9461,170,11017.5%3723603,4153015425ap2001
2001211,9461,200,00017.7%3624603,5323718126ap2002
2002220,9461,200,00018.4%3628643,4524119029ap2003
2003230,0461,200,00019.2%3827653,5393319030ap2004
2004250,0001,400,00017.9%4027673,7315019334ap2005
2010215,0001,040,00020.7%3820583,7061220030bul27nov2010

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.6, 8 Jan 2013; data: 28 Jan 2013