Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father J. Gerard Grondin, M.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Musoma, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1918Born
21 Jun 194224.3Ordained PriestPriest of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
195031.9AppointedPrefect of Musoma, Tanzania
195738.9ResignedPrefect of Musoma, Tanzania
3 Dec 196648.8DiedPrefect Emeritus of Musoma, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for J. Gerard Grondin
Father J. Gerard Grondin M.M. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Musoma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWestbrook, MA, USA
Death PlacePhelps Memorial, Hospital, Ossining, NY, USA
Buried Place (Original)Maryknoll, Cemetery, Ossining, NY, USA

  • a priest for 24.4 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast