Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Renatus Leonard Nkwande

Archbishop of Mwanza, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1965 Born
2 Jul 199529.6Ordained PriestPriest of Mwanza, Tanzania
27 Nov 201045.0AppointedBishop of Bunda, Tanzania
20 Feb 201145.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bunda, Tanzania
11 Feb 201953.2AppointedArchbishop of Mwanza, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Renatus Leonard Nkwande
Archbishop Renatus Leonard Nkwande (born ) Archbishop of Mwanza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMantare
Ordained BishopIn front of, Saint Paul, Cathedral, Bunda, Diocese of Bunda

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Mwanza.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Nov 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,954
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 11 Feb 2019

Quantcast