Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Flavian Matindi Kassala

Bishop of Geita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1967 BornSumve
11 Jul 199931.6Ordained PriestPriest of Geita, Tanzania
28 Apr 201648.3AppointedBishop of Geita, Tanzania
12 Jun 201648.5Ordained BishopBishop of Geita, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Flavian Matindi Kassala
Bishop Flavian Matindi Kassala (born ) Bishop of Geita

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Geita.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Apr 2016
  • ob: CB, 25 May 2016
  • c2: CB, 12 Jun 2016
  • c34: CB, 13 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 22 Jun 2016