Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Antonio Vignato, F.S.C.J. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1878Born
3 Aug 190224.5Ordained PriestPriest of Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
16 Jul 192345.4AppointedPrefect of Nilo Equatoriale, Uganda
10 Dec 193456.8ResignedPrefect of Nilo Equatoriale, Uganda
2 May 193759.2AppointedSuperior General of Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
2 May 194769.2ResignedSuperior General of Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
14 Apr 195476.2DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus

MicroData Summary for Antonio Vignato
Father Antonio Vignato F.S.C.J. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGambellara, Italy

  • a priest for 51.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast