Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Joseph McCauley, C.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fort Portal, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1906Born
24 Jun 193428.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
21 Feb 196154.9AppointedBishop of Fort Portal, Uganda
18 May 196155.1Ordained BishopBishop of Fort Portal, Uganda
16 Nov 197266.6ResignedBishop of Fort Portal, Uganda
1 Nov 198276.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Fort Portal, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Vincent Joseph McCauley
Bishop Vincent Joseph McCauley C.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fort Portal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCouncil Bluffs, IA, USA
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Church, Notre-Dame, IN

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob.loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 76, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 5 Dec 2020

Quantcast