Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis-Joseph Cabana, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Rubaga, Uganda

Titular Archbishop of Carallia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1896Born
7 Oct 192024.0EnteredMember of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
15 Jul 192326.8Perpetual VowsMember of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
24 Jun 192427.7Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
9 Jan 194750.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Uganda
9 Jan 194750.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sufetula
19 Mar 194750.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sufetula
25 Mar 195356.5AppointedArchbishop of Rubaga, Uganda
20 Dec 196064.2ResignedArchbishop of Rubaga, Uganda
20 Dec 196064.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Carallia
17 Jan 198184.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Rubaga, Uganda

MicroData Summary
Louis-Joseph Cabana
Archbishop Louis-Joseph Cabana M. Afr.
(born , died )
Archbishop Emeritus of Rubaga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGranby, Diocese of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada
Ordained PriestMontréal, Archdiocese of Montréal, Québec, Canada
Ordained BishopSaint-Hyacinthe le Confesseur, Cathedral, Saint-Hyacinthe, Diocese of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada
Death PlaceSherbrooke, Archdiocese of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada

Relatives
  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1947, Number 14
  • b: Dictionnaire Biographique des Évèques Catholiques du Canada, Page 322, and Page 323

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 20 May 2025