Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marie-Gaëtan Ogez, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mbarara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1910BornDunkerque, France
29 Jun 193525.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
11 Dec 195646.5AppointedBishop of Mbarara, Uganda
23 Mar 195746.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mbarara, Uganda
25 Nov 196858.5ResignedBishop of Mbarara, Uganda
25 Nov 196858.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Thuccabora
20 Oct 197666.4ResignedTitular Bishop of Thuccabora
10 Jul 200090.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Mbarara, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie-Gaëtan Ogez:
Bishop Jean-Marie-Gaëtan Ogez M. Afr. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mbarara

  • a priest for 65.0 years
  • a bishop for 43.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015