Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert Ayinde Fasina

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ijebu-Ode, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1939Born
3 Mar 198040.6Ordained PriestPriest of Ijebu-Ode, Nigeria
21 Jun 198848.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ijebu-Ode, Nigeria
10 Sep 198849.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Ijebu-Ode, Nigeria
14 Aug 199051.0SucceededBishop of Ijebu-Ode, Nigeria
17 Jan 201979.5RetiredBishop of Ijebu-Ode, Nigeria
29 Jun 202181.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Ijebu-Ode, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Albert Ayinde Fasina
Bishop Albert Ayinde Fasina (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ijebu-Ode

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOdolewu
Ordained BishopS. Sebastien, Cathedral, Ijebu Ode, Diocese of Ijebu-Ode
Death PlaceHome for the Clergy, Ijebu Ode, Diocese of Ijebu-Ode

  • a priest for 41.3 years
  • a bishop for 32.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,014
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Jan 2019
  • d: CB, 30 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 1 Jul 2021

Quantcast