Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Oyo

Dioecesis Oyoensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 18 January 1963
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Ibadan
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Nigeria
  • Square Kilometers: 25,269 (9,760 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 1480, Mariama Rd., Oyo, Nigeria
  • Telephone: (038)240.213

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Oyo
3 March 1949ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Lagos Prefecture Apostolic of Oyo (erected)
Diocese of Oyo
18 January 1963ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Oyo Diocese of Oyo
3 March 1995Territory LostDiocese of Oyo Diocese of Osogbo (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Oyo
195014,1051,016,0451.4%15159405ap1951
Diocese of Oyo
197040,7081,755,0002.3%427311,313302511ap1971
198055,7993,121,0001.8%918272,066202312ap1981
198866,0006,290,0001.0%1716332,000193932ap1991
199930,0002,040,0001.5%137201,50073618ap2000
200031,0002,031,5001.5%174211,47643216ap2001
200130,0002,030,0001.5%182201,50023322ap2002
200230,2002,031,6001.5%182201,51023422ap2003
200330,2002,031,6001.5%201211,43813423ap2004
200430,2002,031,6601.5%222241,25824126ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 12 Oct 2013