Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel Adetoyese Badejo

Bishop of Oyo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1961 BornFuntua
4 Jan 198624.5Ordained PriestPriest of Oyo, Nigeria
3 Mar 199533.6IncardinatedPriest of Osogbo, Nigeria
14 Aug 200746.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Oyo, Nigeria
20 Oct 200746.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Oyo, Nigeria
4 Nov 200948.3SucceededBishop of Oyo, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Adetoyese Badejo:
Bishop Emmanuel Adetoyese Badejo (born ) Bishop of Oyo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Oyo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Aug 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,555
  • s: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013