Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julius Babatunde Adelakun

Bishop Emeritus of Oyo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Nov 1934 BornOniganbari
27 Jun 196530.6Ordained PriestPriest of Oyo, Nigeria
16 Nov 197238.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Oyo, Nigeria
16 Nov 197238.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thunigaba
11 Feb 197338.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thunigaba
13 Apr 197338.4AppointedBishop of Oyo, Nigeria
4 Nov 200975.0RetiredBishop of Oyo, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Julius Babatunde Adelakun
Bishop Julius Babatunde Adelakun (born Nov 1934) Bishop Emeritus of Oyo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Oyo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 2 May 2016