Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Owen McCoy, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Oyo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1907BornWest Derby, Liverpool, Great Britain
29 Jun 193325.7Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
1 Apr 194941.5AppointedPrefect of Oyo, Nigeria
18 Jan 196355.3AppointedBishop of Oyo, Nigeria
28 Apr 196355.5Ordained BishopBishop of Oyo, Nigeria
13 Apr 197365.5ResignedBishop of Oyo, Nigeria
28 Jun 198880.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Oyo, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Owen McCoy:
Bishop Owen McCoy M. Afr. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Oyo

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015