Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Anthony Olubunmi Cardinal Okogie

Archbishop Emeritus of Lagos

Cardinal-Priest of Beata Vergine Maria del Monte Carmelo a Mostacciano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1936 BornLagos
11 Dec 196630.5Ordained PriestPriest of Lagos, Nigeria
5 Jun 197135.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Oyo, Nigeria
5 Jun 197135.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Mascula
29 Aug 197135.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mascula
19 Sep 197236.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lagos, Nigeria
13 Apr 197336.8AppointedArchbishop of Lagos, Nigeria
21 Oct 200367.3Elevated to Cardinal
21 Oct 200367.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Beata Vergine Maria del Monte Carmelo a Mostacciano
22 May 200467.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Beata Vergine Maria del Monte Carmelo a Mostacciano
25 May 201275.9RetiredArchbishop of Lagos, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Anthony Olubunmi Okogie:
Cardinal Anthony Olubunmi Okogie (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lagos

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Lagos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 May 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013