Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Odogwu Elue

Bishop of Issele-Uku


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1956 BornUte-Ogbeje
18 Aug 198428.3Ordained PriestPriest of Issele-Uku, Nigeria
14 Nov 200347.6AppointedBishop of Issele-Uku, Nigeria
21 Feb 200447.8Ordained BishopBishop of Issele-Uku, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Michael Odogwu Elue:
Bishop Michael Odogwu Elue (born ) Bishop of Issele-Uku

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Issele-Uku.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,537

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015