Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel Otteh

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Issele-Uku, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1927Born
30 Jul 196134.5Ordained PriestPriest of Onitsha, Nigeria
11 Jun 199063.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Onitsha, Nigeria
11 Jun 199063.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Cova
2 Sep 199063.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cova
8 Nov 199669.8AppointedBishop of Issele-Uku, Nigeria
14 Nov 200376.8RetiredBishop of Issele-Uku, Nigeria
27 Jul 201285.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Issele-Uku, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Otteh
Bishop Emmanuel Otteh (born 1927, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Issele-Uku

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAwkuzu

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,189
  • d: CB, 30 Jul 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast