Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gabriel ’Leke Abegunrin

Archbishop of Ibadan, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1949 Born
21 Apr 197929.5Ordained PriestPriest of Oyo, Nigeria
3 Mar 199545.4AppointedBishop of Osogbo, Nigeria
13 May 199545.6Ordained BishopBishop of Osogbo, Nigeria
29 Oct 201364.0AppointedArchbishop of Ibadan, Nigeria
29 Oct 201364.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Osogbo, Nigeria
24 Jan 201464.3InstalledArchbishop of Ibadan, Nigeria
30 Jun 201666.7CeasedApostolic Administrator of Osogbo, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Gabriel ’Leke Abegunrin (VIAF: 235783942)
Archbishop Gabriel ’Leke Abegunrin (born ) Archbishop of Ibadan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIwere-Ile
Ordained BishopSaint Benedict, Cathedral, Osogbo, Diocese of Osogbo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Ibadan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,591
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,667
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Oct 2013
  • i: CB, 20 Jan 2014
  • ab: CB, 15 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.3, 16 Feb 2019; Data: 1 Mar 2019

Quantcast