Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry J. Althoff

Deceased

Bishop of Belleville, Illinois


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1873BornAviston, IL
26 Jul 190228.9Ordained PriestPriest of Belleville, Illinois, USA
4 Dec 191340.3AppointedBishop of Belleville, Illinois, USA
24 Feb 191440.5Ordained BishopBishop of Belleville, Illinois, USA
3 Jul 194773.8DiedBishop of Belleville, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Henry J. Althoff:
Bishop Henry J. Althoff (born , died ) Bishop of Belleville

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 33.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 6
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013