Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Theodore Henry Reverman

Deceased

Bishop of Superior, Wisconsin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1877BornLouisville
26 Jul 190123.9Ordained PriestPriest of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
2 Jul 192648.8AppointedBishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA
30 Nov 192649.3Ordained BishopBishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA
9 Feb 192749.5InstalledBishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA
18 Jul 194163.9DiedBishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for Theodore Henry Reverman
Bishop Theodore Henry Reverman (born , died ) Bishop of Superior

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1926, Number 82
  • c1: CB, 28 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Jun 2016