Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Ridgley Cotton

Deceased

Bishop of Owensboro, Kentucky, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1895Born
17 Jun 192024.7Ordained PriestPriest of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
16 Dec 193742.2AppointedBishop of Owensboro, Kentucky, USA
24 Feb 193842.4Ordained BishopBishop of Owensboro, Kentucky, USA
25 Sep 196065.0DiedBishop of Owensboro, Kentucky, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Ridgley Cotton
Bishop Francis Ridgley Cotton (born , died ) Bishop of Owensboro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBardstown

  • a priest for 40.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1938, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018