Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John George Bennett

Deceased

Bishop of Lafayette in Indiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1891BornDunnington
27 Jun 191423.4Ordained PriestPriest of Fort Wayne, Indiana, USA
11 Nov 194453.8AppointedBishop of Lafayette in Indiana, USA
10 Jan 194554.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lafayette in Indiana, USA
20 Nov 195766.8DiedBishop of Lafayette in Indiana, USA

MicroData Summary for John George Bennett:
Bishop John George Bennett (born , died ) Bishop of Lafayette in Indiana

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013