Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James McGolrick

Deceased

Bishop of Duluth, Minnesota, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1841Born
11 Jun 186726.1Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
29 Nov 188948.5AppointedBishop of Duluth, Minnesota, USA
27 Dec 188948.6Ordained BishopBishop of Duluth, Minnesota, USA
23 Jan 191876.7DiedBishop of Duluth, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for James McGolrick
Bishop James McGolrick (born , died ) Bishop of Duluth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBorrisokane, Diocese of Killaloe, Ireland
Ordained BishopSt. Paul, Archdiocese of Saint Paul, Minnesota

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 253
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017