Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptist Vincent de Paul Wehrle, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bismarck, North Dakota, USA

Titular Bishop of Teos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1855Born
2 Sep 187620.7ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
2 Sep 187923.7Solemn VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
23 Apr 188226.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
9 Apr 191054.3AppointedBishop of Bismarck, North Dakota, USA
19 May 191054.4Ordained BishopBishop of Bismarck, North Dakota, USA
11 Dec 193983.9RetiredBishop of Bismarck, North Dakota, USA
11 Dec 193983.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Teos
2 Nov 194185.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Bismarck, North Dakota, USA

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Vincent de Paul Wehrle (VIAF: 23697626)
Bishop John Baptist Vincent de Paul Wehrle O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bismarck

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBerg, Switzerland
Death PlaceBismarck, Diocese of Bismarck, North Dakota

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 86
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1910, Number 35
  • b: Biographia Benedictina, 18 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Sep 2021

Quantcast