Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Konstantin Rampa

Deceased

Bishop of Chur, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1837Born
25 May 186123.6Ordained PriestPriest of Como, Italy
186325.3IncardinatedPriest of Chur, Switzerland
28 May 187941.7SelectedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
22 Sep 187942.0ConfirmedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
9 Nov 187942.1Ordained BishopBishop of Chur, Switzerland
17 Sep 188851.0DiedBishop of Chur, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Franz Konstantin Rampa (VIAF: 305972922)
Bishop Franz Konstantin Rampa (born , died ) Bishop of Chur

EventPlace
Birth PlacePoschiavo, Diocese of Chur
Ordained BishopCathedral, Chur, Diocese of Chur

  • a priest for 27.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 234
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1879, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017