Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Moriarty

Deceased

Bishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1814Born
25 Apr 183924.6Ordained PriestPriest of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
8 Mar 185439.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
8 Mar 185439.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Antigonea
25 Apr 185439.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antigonea
22 Jul 185641.9SucceededBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
1 Oct 187763.1DiedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland

MicroData Summary for David Moriarty (VIAF: 59848415)
Bishop David Moriarty (born , died ) Bishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDerryvrin, Diocese of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe
Ordained BishopDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 106, and Page 118
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1854, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jan 2017