Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Peter Mirer

Deceased

Bishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1778Born
19 Dec 180123.2Ordained PriestPriest of Chur, Switzerland
13 May 183657.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
20 Apr 184768.5AppointedBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
29 Jun 184768.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
30 Aug 186283.9DiedBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Johann Peter Mirer (VIAF: 89965383)
Bishop Johann Peter Mirer (born , died ) Bishop of Sankt Gallen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceObersaxen

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 499
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1847, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 28 Dec 2016