Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Arnold-Obrist

Deceased

Bishop of Basel, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1796Born
27 May 182023.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Basel, Switzerland
23 Sep 182023.8Ordained PriestPriest of Basel, Switzerland
4 Aug 185457.7SelectedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
16 Nov 185457.9ConfirmedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
18 Mar 185558.3Ordained BishopBishop of Basel, Switzerland
17 Dec 186266.0DiedBishop of Basel, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Karl Arnold-Obrist (VIAF: 314873893)
Bishop Karl Arnold-Obrist (born , died ) Bishop of Basel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSolothurn, Diocese of Basel
Ordained BishopSt. Ursus Cathedral, Solothurn, Diocese of Basel

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 142
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jan 2017