Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nikolaus Franz Florentini

Deceased

Bishop of Chur, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1794Born
5 Apr 181722.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Chur, Switzerland
7 Apr 181722.5Ordained PriestPriest of Chur, Switzerland
26 May 185964.7SelectedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
26 Sep 185965.0ConfirmedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
18 Dec 185965.2Ordained BishopBishop of Chur, Switzerland
27 Feb 187782.4RetiredBishop of Chur, Switzerland
29 Jun 188186.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Chur, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Nikolaus Franz Florentini (VIAF: 314889510)
Bishop Nikolaus Franz Florentini (born , died ) Bishop of Chur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMüstair, Diocese of Chur
Ordained BishopChur, Diocese of Chur

  • a priest for 64.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 234
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jan 2017