Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg Prünster

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

Titular Bishop of Hypsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1774³BornLeithen
1 Oct 179723.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
8 Oct 179723.5Ordained PriestPriest of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
1 Feb 183661.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
1 Feb 183661.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Hypsus
6 Mar 183661.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hypsus
12 Nov 186187.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georg Prünster (VIAF: 264243313)
Bishop Georg Prünster (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 217
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1836, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Aug 2016