Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kaspar de Carl ab Hobenbalken

Deceased

Bishop of Chur, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1781Born
22 Dec 180423.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Chur-Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
30 Dec 180423.7Ordained PriestPriest of Chur-Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
27 Jan 184361.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Chur-Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
27 Jan 184361.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippos
19 Nov 184362.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippos
9 Jan 184462.7SucceededBishop of Chur, Switzerland
19 Apr 185978.0DiedBishop of Chur, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Kaspar de Carl ab Hobenbalken (VIAF: 310745363)
Bishop Kaspar de Carl ab Hobenbalken (born , died ) Bishop of Chur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTarasp
Ordained BishopCathedral, Chur, Diocese of Chur

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 170, and Page 215
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,051
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast