Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustus Maria Bernard Anthony John Gebhard Toebbe

Deceased

Bishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1829Born
14 Sep 185425.6Ordained PriestPriest of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
24 Sep 186940.6AppointedBishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA
9 Jan 187040.9Ordained BishopBishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA
2 May 188455.2DiedBishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA

MicroData Summary for Augustus Maria Bernard Anthony John Gebhard Toebbe
Bishop Augustus Maria Bernard Anthony John Gebhard Toebbe (born , died ) Bishop of Covington

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMeppen, Diocese of Osnabrück, Germany
Ordained BishopSaint Philomena, Cincinnati, Archdiocese of Cincinnati, Ohio
Death PlaceCovington, Diocese of Covington, Kentucky

  • a priest for 29.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 229
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017