Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Albert Duffy

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Grand Island, Nebraska

Titular Bishop of Silandus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1873BornSaint Paul
27 May 189925.7Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
27 Jan 191339.4AppointedBishop of Kearney, Nebraska, USA
16 Apr 191339.6Ordained BishopBishop of Kearney, Nebraska, USA
5 Jun 193157.7ResignedBishop of Grand Island, Nebraska, USA
5 Jun 193157.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Silandus
12 Feb 196894.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Grand Island, Nebraska, USA

MicroData Summary for James Albert Duffy:
Bishop James Albert Duffy (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Grand Island

  • a priest for 68.7 years
  • a bishop for 54.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013