Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Joseph Tief

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Concordia, Kansas

Titular Bishop of Nisa in Lycia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1881BornGreenwich, CT
11 Jun 190827.3Ordained PriestPriest of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
16 Dec 192039.8AppointedBishop of Concordia, Kansas, USA
30 Mar 192140.1Ordained BishopBishop of Concordia, Kansas, USA
11 Jun 193857.3ResignedBishop of Concordia, Kansas, USA
11 Jun 193857.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Nisa in Lycia
22 Sep 196584.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Concordia, Kansas, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Joseph Tief:
Bishop Francis Joseph Tief (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Concordia

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 44.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013