Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Thomas Guilfoyle

Deceased

Bishop of Altoona, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1892Born
2 Jun 191724.4Ordained PriestPriest of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA
8 Aug 193643.6AppointedBishop of Altoona, Pennsylvania, USA
30 Nov 193643.9Ordained BishopBishop of Altoona, Pennsylvania, USA
10 Jun 195764.4DiedBishop of Altoona, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Richard Thomas Guilfoyle
Bishop Richard Thomas Guilfoyle (born , died ) Bishop of Altoona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAdrian

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 19 Feb 2018