Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adriano Jaime Miriam Veigle, T.O.R. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Borba, Amazonas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1912BornLilly, PA, USA
22 May 193724.6Ordained PriestPriest of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance
18 Jun 196451.7AppointedPrelate of Borba, Amazonas, Brazil
23 Mar 196653.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Gigthi
9 Jun 196653.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gigthi
26 May 197865.6ResignedTitular Bishop of Gigthi
6 Jul 198875.8RetiredPrelate of Borba, Amazonas, Brazil
3 Apr 200188.5DiedPrelate Emeritus of Borba, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Adriano Jaime Miriam Veigle:
Bishop Adriano Jaime Miriam Veigle T.O.R. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Borba

  • a priest for 63.8 years
  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015