Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael John Hoban

Deceased

Bishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1853Born
22 May 188026.9Ordained PriestPriest of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA
1 Feb 189642.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA
1 Feb 189642.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Alalis
22 Mar 189642.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alalis
3 Feb 189945.6SucceededBishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA
13 Nov 192673.4DiedBishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael John Hoban
Bishop Michael John Hoban (born , died ) Bishop of Scranton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWaterloo, NJ, Diocese of Newark, New Jersey
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Cathedral, Scranton, Diocese of Scranton, Pennsylvania

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 83, and Page 505
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017