Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Charles Gazailhan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vannes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1811Born
24 May 183423.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Oct 186352.4SelectedBishop of Vannes, France
21 Dec 186352.6ConfirmedBishop of Vannes, France
6 Mar 186452.8Ordained BishopBishop of Vannes, France
6 Nov 186554.4ResignedBishop of Vannes, France
9 Jan 187260.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Vannes, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Charles Gazailhan (VIAF: 103650620)
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Charles Gazailhan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vannes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBordeaux, Archdiocese of Bordeaux
Ordained BishopS. Andre, Bordeaux, Archdiocese of Bordeaux

  • a priest for 37.6 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 584
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1864, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 31 Jan 2017