Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine-Charles Cousseau

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Angoulême, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1805Born
13 Jun 182923.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 185044.8SelectedBishop of Angoulême, France
30 Sep 185045.1ConfirmedBishop of Angoulême, France
29 Dec 185045.3Ordained BishopBishop of Angoulême, France
7 Jan 185145.4InstalledBishop of Angoulême, France
3 Mar 187367.5ResignedBishop of Angoulême, France
13 Oct 187570.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Angoulême, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine-Charles Cousseau (VIAF: 73985397)
Bishop Antoine-Charles Cousseau (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Angoulême

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Jouin-sous-Châtillon
Ordained BishopCathedral, Poitiers, Diocese of Poitiers

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 260
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1850, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 31 Jan 2017