Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Sébastien-Ferdinand Terris

Deceased

Bishop of Fréjus, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1824Born
29 May 184723.0Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
25 Mar 187651.9SelectedBishop of Fréjus, France
7 Apr 187651.9ConfirmedBishop of Fréjus, France
29 Jun 187652.1Ordained BishopBishop of Fréjus, France
8 Jul 187652.1InstalledBishop of Fréjus, France
8 Apr 188560.9DiedBishop of Fréjus, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Sébastien-Ferdinand Terris (VIAF: 214040327)
Bishop Joseph-Sébastien-Ferdinand Terris (born , died ) Bishop of Fréjus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBonnieux
Ordained BishopCathedral, Carpentras, Archdiocese of Avignon

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 274
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017