Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Marie Trégaro

Deceased

Bishop of Sées {Séez}, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1824Born
23 Sep 184824.2Ordained PriestPriest
25 Oct 188157.3SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Sées {Séez}, France
18 Nov 188157.4ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Sées {Séez}, France
18 Nov 188157.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Doliche
1 Dec 188157.4SucceededBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
25 Jan 188257.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
31 Jan 188257.6InstalledBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
6 Jan 189772.5DiedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France

MicroData Summary for François-Marie Trégaro (VIAF: 12611077)
Bishop François-Marie Trégaro (born , died ) Bishop of Sées {Séez}

EventPlace
Birth PlacePeillac
Ordained BishopSte Anne d'Auray

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 248, and Page 490
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 May 2017