Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jules François Lecoq

Deceased

Bishop of Nantes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1821Born
17 May 184523.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jan 187553.2SelectedBishop of Luçon, France
15 Mar 187553.4ConfirmedBishop of Luçon, France
1 May 187553.5Ordained BishopBishop of Luçon, France
30 Jul 187755.8SelectedBishop of Nantes, France
20 Aug 187755.8ConfirmedBishop of Nantes, France
25 Dec 189271.2DiedBishop of Nantes, France

MicroData Summary for Jules François Lecoq (VIAF: 54137229)
Bishop Jules François Lecoq (born , died ) Bishop of Nantes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVire
Ordained BishopSt Jean, Caen

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 351, and Page 402
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017