Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Arthur-Xavier Ducellier

Deceased

Archbishop of Besançon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1832Born
11 Oct 185725.1Ordained PriestPriest of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France
22 Jun 187845.8SelectedBishop of Bayonne, France
15 Jul 187845.8ConfirmedBishop of Bayonne, France
24 Sep 187846.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bayonne, France
2 May 188754.6SelectedArchbishop of Besançon, France
26 May 188754.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Besançon, France
29 Jun 189360.8DiedArchbishop of Besançon, France

MicroData Summary for Arthur-Xavier Ducellier
Archbishop Arthur-Xavier Ducellier (born , died ) Archbishop of Besançon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSoliers
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bayeux, Diocese of Bayeux (-Lisieux)

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 138, and Page 150
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1878, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Apr 2017